Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elói Róggia, S.A.C.

Prelate Emeritus of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1942 Born
2 Feb 196522.3ProfessedMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
19 Dec 197129.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
3 May 200663.6AppointedPrelate of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil
14 Jul 200663.8Ordained BishopPrelate of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil
20 Sep 201775.0RetiredPrelate of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Elói Róggia
Bishop Elói Róggia S.A.C. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Borba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaxinal do Soturno
Ordained BishopGinásio Municipal Ardomar Somensi, Palotina

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Borba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 May 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,207
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018