Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Carlos Bach

Bishop of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1954 Born
3 Dec 197723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil
27 Jul 200551.2AppointedBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
27 Oct 200551.4Ordained BishopBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
24 Nov 200551.5InstalledBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
3 Oct 201258.4AppointedBishop of São José dos Pinhais, Parana, Brazil
19 Apr 201762.9AppointedBishop of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Carlos Bach
Bishop Francisco Carlos Bach (born ) Bishop of Joinville

EventPlace
Birth PlacePonta Grossa, Diocese of Ponta Grossa, Parana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Joinville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,006
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Oct 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Apr 2017