Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geraldo Claudio Luiz Micheletto Pellanda, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1916Born
23 Sep 193923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
9 Nov 196044.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil
9 Nov 196044.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mades
11 Feb 196144.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mades
20 Mar 196548.5SucceededBishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil
24 Apr 196548.6InstalledBishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil
2 Jan 199174.3DiedBishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Geraldo Claudio Luiz Micheletto Pellanda
Bishop Geraldo Claudio Luiz Micheletto Pellanda C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Ponta Grossa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUmbará

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018