Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Michael Ebejer, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of União da Vitória, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1929Born
24 Jan 195424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
3 Dec 197647.3AppointedBishop of União da Vitória, Parana, Brazil
6 Mar 197747.5Ordained BishopBishop of União da Vitória, Parana, Brazil
3 Jan 200777.4RetiredBishop of União da Vitória, Parana, Brazil
11 Jun 202191.8DiedBishop Emeritus of União da Vitória, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Walter Michael Ebejer (VIAF: 159031762)
Bishop Walter Michael Ebejer O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of União da Vitória

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDingli, Malta
Ordained BishopStade, União da Vitória, Diocese of União da Vitória, Parana
Death PlaceHospital e Maternidade APMI, União da Vitória, Diocese of União da Vitória, Parana

  • a priest for 67.3 years
  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,805
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 11 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 Jun 2021

Quantcast