Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Wladimir Lopes Dias

Bishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1957 Born
12 Dec 199740.1Ordained PriestPriest of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Dec 201154.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
21 Dec 201154.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sita
4 Mar 201254.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sita
14 May 201456.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Colatina, Espirito Santo, Brazil
4 Mar 201557.3AppointedBishop of Colatina, Espirito Santo, Brazil
2 May 201557.5InstalledBishop of Colatina, Espirito Santo, Brazil
13 Jan 202163.2AppointedBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Wladimir Lopes Dias
Bishop Joaquim Wladimir Lopes Dias (born ) Bishop of Lorena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCafelândia, Diocese of Lins, Sao Paulo
Ordained BishopGinásio Dr. Nicolino de Lucca, Jundiaí, Diocese of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lorena.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,272
  • ab: CB, 14 May 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2015
  • i: CB, 5 Mar 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 13 Jan 2021

Quantcast