Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ângelo Ademir Mezzari, R.C.J.

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of São Paulo, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Fiorentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1957 Born
31 Jan 198123.8ProfessedMember of Rogationists of the Heart of Jesus
22 Dec 198427.7Ordained PriestPriest of Rogationists of the Heart of Jesus
2 Aug 201053.3AppointedSuperior General of Rogationists of the Heart of Jesus
21 Jul 201659.3CeasedSuperior General of Rogationists of the Heart of Jesus
8 Jul 202063.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
8 Jul 202063.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Fiorentino
19 Sep 202063.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fiorentino

MicroData Summary for Ângelo Ademir Mezzari
Father Ângelo Ademir Mezzari R.C.J. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForquilhinha, Diocese of Tubarão, Santa Catarina
Ordained BishopSagrado Coração Misericordioso de Jesus, Sanctuary, Içara, Diocese of Criciúma, Santa Catarina

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of São Paulo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 8 Jul 2020
  • c34: CB, 4 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 5 Aug 2020

Quantcast