Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rubens Sevilha, O.C.D.

Bishop of Bauru, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1959 Born
3 Feb 198020.3ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
24 Mar 198424.4Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
19 Oct 198526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
21 Dec 201152.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
21 Dec 201152.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Idassa
18 Mar 201252.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Idassa
28 Mar 201858.5AppointedBishop of Bauru, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Rubens Sevilha
Bishop Rubens Sevilha O.C.D. (born ) Bishop of Bauru

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarabaí
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vitória, Archdiocese of Vitória, Espirito Santo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bauru.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2011
  • ob: CB, 21 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,275
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast