Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastião Lima Duarte

Bishop of Caxias do Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1964 Born
30 Nov 199127.6Ordained PriestPriest of Zé-Doca, Maranhão, Brazil
7 Jul 201046.2AppointedBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil
18 Sep 201046.4Ordained BishopBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil
25 Sep 201046.4InstalledBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil
20 Dec 201753.7AppointedBishop of Caxias do Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Sebastião Lima Duarte
Bishop Sebastião Lima Duarte (born ) Bishop of Caxias do Maranhão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarutapera
Ordained Bishoppraça pública, Carutapera

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caxias do Maranhão.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,794
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast