Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Lima Soares

Bishop of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1964 Born
15 Jul 199025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Imperatriz, Maranhão, Brazil
19 Sep 201853.8AppointedBishop of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil
21 Nov 201854.0Ordained BishopBishop of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Lima Soares
Bishop Francisco Lima Soares (born ) Bishop of Carolina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAraguatins
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora de Fatima, Cathedral, Imperatriz, Diocese of Imperatriz, Maranhão

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Carolina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2018
  • ob: CB, 20 Sep 2018
  • c2: CB, 17 Nov 2018
  • c3+: CB, 21 Nov 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,943

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast