Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Carolina

Dioecesis Carolinensis in Brasilia



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • José Soares Filho, O.F.M. Cap., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 16 October 1979
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Maranho
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 18,252 (7,049 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste 5
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, C.P. 15, Av. Getulio Vargas 23, 65980-000 Carolina, MA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (099)3531-2292
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Carolina
14 January 1958ErectedTerritorial Prelature of São José do Grajaú Territorial Prelature of Carolina (erected)
Diocese of Carolina
16 October 1979ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Carolina Diocese of Carolina
27 June 1987Territory LostDiocese of Carolina Diocese of Imperatriz (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Carolina
1966120,000150,00080.0%15158,00015256ap1967
197072,16081,75088.3%15154,81015147ap1971
1976270,000286,42394.3%1151616,875152714ap1977
Diocese of Carolina
1980235,000251,00093.6%4121614,687122816ap1981
1990107,200135,00079.4%45911,911576ap1991
1999120,980150,00080.7%72913,4421297ap2000
2000121,980152,00080.3%61717,42511128ap2001
2001115,000148,00077.7%71814,37511128ap2002
2002120,000148,00081.1%81913,33311128ap2003
2003116,000145,00080.0%81912,8881128ap2004
2004121,000150,00080.7%81913,4441118ap2005
2006136,000156,00087.2%1011112,363199ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011