Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelino Correr, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1932Born
8 Jan 195017.9EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Jan 195118.9Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Jan 195421.9Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Mar 195725.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Jun 195725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
13 Mar 199159.1AppointedBishop of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil
21 Apr 199159.2Ordained BishopBishop of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil
15 Oct 200371.7ResignedBishop of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil
18 Apr 200674.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Marcelino Correr
Bishop Marcelino Correr O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Carolina

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiracicaba, Diocese of Campinas
Ordained DeaconSão Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo
Ordained PriestPiracicaba, Diocese of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo
Ordained BishopGinásio de Esportes junto ao Estádio Municipal, Piracicaba, Diocese of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,634
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • prof/od/c01/loc: AK, 23 Sep 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 16 Oct 2022