Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernesto de Paula

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo

Titular Bishop of Hierocaesarea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1899BornSão Paulo
14 Aug 192728.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 194142.8AppointedBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
4 Jan 194242.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
30 Jun 194546.4AppointedBishop of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
9 Jan 196060.9ResignedBishop of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
9 Jan 196060.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
31 Dec 199495.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ernesto de Paula:
Bishop Ernesto de Paula (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Piracicaba

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 53.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013