Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gastão Liberal Pinto

Deceased

Bishop of São Carlos do Pinhal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1884BornSão Paulo
6 Mar 191025.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 193449.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of São Carlos do Pinhal, Brazil
24 Mar 193449.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
20 May 193450.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
15 Oct 193753.5SucceededBishop of São Carlos do Pinhal, Brazil
24 Oct 194561.5DiedBishop of São Carlos do Pinhal, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gastão Liberal Pinto:
Bishop Gastão Liberal Pinto (born , died ) Bishop of São Carlos do Pinhal

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013