Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Marcondes Homem de Melo

Deceased

Bishop of São Carlos do Pinhal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1860BornPindamonhangaba
11 Mar 188322.5Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Brazil
26 Apr 190645.6AppointedBishop of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil
1 May 190645.6AppointedArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil
29 Jun 190645.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil
6 Dec 190646.2ResignedArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil
6 Dec 190646.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia
9 Aug 190847.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of São Carlos do Pinhal, Brazil
22 Nov 190848.2InstalledBishop of São Carlos do Pinhal, Brazil
15 Oct 193777.1DiedBishop of São Carlos do Pinhal, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Marcondes Homem de Melo:
Archbishop José Marcondes Homem de Melo (born , died ) Bishop of São Carlos do Pinhal

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 82
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013