Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Soares Filho, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Carolina, Maranho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1956 BornItapetim
28 Oct 199034.2Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
28 Apr 199134.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Jan 200346.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Carolina, Maranho, Brazil
26 Apr 200346.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Carolina, Maranho, Brazil
15 Oct 200347.2SucceededBishop of Carolina, Maranho, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Soares Filho:
Bishop José Soares Filho O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Carolina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Carolina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015