Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Alves dos Santos, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Paranaguá, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1956Born
1 Jan 197821.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
Apr 1982³25.3Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Dec 198225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Aug 200649.6AppointedBishop of Paranaguá, Parana, Brazil
30 Sep 200649.8Ordained BishopBishop of Paranaguá, Parana, Brazil
18 Oct 200649.8InstalledBishop of Paranaguá, Parana, Brazil
9 Apr 201558.3DiedBishop of Paranaguá, Parana, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João Alves dos Santos
Bishop João Alves dos Santos O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Paranaguá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlto Alegre

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Aug 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,249
  • d: CB, 9 Apr 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast