Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Alto Solimões

Dioecesis Solimões Superioris



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 14 August 1991
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Manaus
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Amazonas
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 130,240 (50,305 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte I
  • Mailing Address: Rua Pedro Teixeira 540, Centro, 69640-000 Tabatinga, AM, Brazil
  • Telephone: (097) 3412-2514
  • Fax: 3412-3320

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Alto Solimões
23 May 1910ErectedDiocese of Amazonas Prefecture Apostolic of Alto Solimões (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Alto Solimões
11 August 1950ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Alto Solimões Territorial Prelature of Alto Solimões
Diocese of Alto Solimões
14 August 1991ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Alto Solimões Diocese of Alto Solimões

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Alto Solimões
195022,90728,00081.8%16161,43116113ap1951
196338,00046,00082.6%13132,923125ap1967
197646,40149,52193.7%12123,8661488ap1977
198045,80055,00083.3%110114,1631188ap1981
199070,000105,00066.7%38116,36315228ap1991
Diocese of Alto Solimões
199997,000145,00066.9%59146,92817158ap2000
200099,000160,00061.9%59147,07119158ap2001
200199,000163,00060.7%59147,07119158ap2002
200299,000165,00060.0%59147,07119158ap2003
200398,000169,00058.0%58137,538120148ap2004
200498,000169,00058.0%58137,538220148ap2005
200699,300130,24076.2%67137,63819148ap2007
2012124,900184,70067.6%410148,92119148ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 28 Aug 2014