Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Evangelista Galea, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prefect of Alto Solimões


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1882BornCefalonia
23 Dec 190523.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
6 Sep 191028.3AppointedPrefect of Alto Solimões, Brazil
31 Jan 193855.7DiedPrefect of Alto Solimões, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Evangelista Galea:
Priest Evangelista Galea O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prefect of Alto Solimões

  • a priest for 32.1 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013