Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Grajaú

Dioecesis Graiahuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Rubival Cabral Britto, O.F.M. Cap., Bishop
  • Serafino Faustino Spreafico, O.F.M. Cap., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 9 October 1984
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Maranhão
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 38,742 (14,964 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste 5
  • Official Web Site: http://diocesegrajau.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Praca Dom Roberto Colombo 60, 65940-000 Grajau, MA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (099)3532-8025

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of São José do Grajaú
10 February 1922ErectedArchdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão Territorial Prelature of São José do Grajaú (erected)
22 July 1939Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of São José do Grajaú (Turiaçu and Carutapera)
Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão (Pinheiro, Alcântara, Cururupu, Guimarães, Bequimão, and Santa Helena)
Territorial Prelature of Pinheiro (erected)
14 January 1958Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of São José do Grajaú (Carolina, Amarante, Imperatriz, Montes Altos, Porto Franco, and Presidente Vargas) Territorial Prelature of Carolina (erected)
22 June 1968Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of São José do Grajaú (Esperantinopolis)
Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão (Parts of Bacabal and Ipixuna along with Altamira do Maranhäo, Igarapé Grande, Lago da Pedra, Lago do Junco, Lago Verde, Lima Campos, Olho d'Água dos Cunhas, Pedreiras, Pio XII, Poçâo de Pedras, Rosinopolis, Santo Antonio dos Lopes, and Vitorino Freiré)
Diocese of Bacabal (erected)
22 June 1968Territory AddedArchdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão (Dom Pedro and Governador Archer) Territorial Prelature of São José do Grajaú
Diocese of São José do Grajaú
4 August 1981ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of São José do Grajaú Diocese of São José do Grajaú
Diocese of Grajaú
9 October 1984Name ChangedDiocese of São José do Grajaú Diocese of Grajaú

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of São José do Grajaú
1966127,000130,00097.7%16167,937186ap1967
1970179,670195,00092.1%171710,56818168ap1971
1976210,200212,40099.0%2161811,67719209ap1977
1980235,000255,00092.2%1815337,12117239ap1981
Diocese of São José do Grajaú
Diocese of Grajaú
1990337,000408,00082.6%5131818,722142011ap1991
1999300,000400,00075.0%6142015,000142610ap2000
2000276,250325,00085.0%7142113,154142611ap2001
2001297,500350,00085.0%8162412,395162511ap2002
2002314,500370,00085.0%9152413,104232711ap2003
2003314,500370,00085.0%10142413,104212911ap2004
2004314,500370,00085.0%12132512,580202811ap2005
2006307,000384,00079.9%10112114,619183212ap2007
2013335,000419,00080.0%12102215,2275273213ap2014
2016329,000409,67980.3%14122612,65311302714ap2017
2019337,600447,90375.4%1816349,92913344119ap2020
2021337,338479,74070.3%1916359,63811374824ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Territorial Prelature of São José do Grajaú
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 60, Page 582, and Page 583
  • Diocese of Grajaú
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 77, Page 85, and Page 86
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
    Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 23 Sep 2023