Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valenti Giacomo Lazzeri, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of São José do Grajaú, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1925Born
4 Mar 195025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
18 May 197146.3AppointedPrelate of São José do Grajaú, Brazil
18 May 197146.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus
25 Jul 197146.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus
26 May 197853.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus
17 Sep 198156.7AppointedBishop of São José do Grajaú, Brazil
6 Jan 198358.0DiedBishop of São José do Grajaú, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Valenti Giacomo Lazzeri
Bishop Valenti Giacomo Lazzeri O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of São José do Grajaú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCologno al Serio

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast