Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serafino Faustino Spreafico, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Grajaú, Maranho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1939 BornBusnago
23 Mar 196626.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
13 May 198747.8AppointedBishop of Grajaú, Maranho, Brazil
12 Jul 198748.0Ordained BishopBishop of Grajaú, Maranho, Brazil
2 Nov 199556.3ResignedBishop of Grajaú, Maranho, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Serafino Faustino Spreafico:
Bishop Serafino Faustino Spreafico O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Grajaú

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Grajaú.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,713

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013