Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rino Carlesi, M.C.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Balsas, Maranho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1922BornMontemurlo, Italy
31 May 194724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
12 Jan 196744.4AppointedPrelate of Santo Antônio de Balsas, Maranho, Brazil
12 Jan 196744.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Africa
2 Apr 196744.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Africa
26 May 197855.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Africa
26 Oct 198159.2AppointedBishop of Balsas, Maranho, Brazil
15 Apr 199875.7RetiredBishop of Balsas, Maranho, Brazil
25 Aug 199977.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Balsas, Maranho, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Rino Carlesi:
Bishop Rino Carlesi M.C.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Balsas

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013