Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Longo Dorni

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1907BornOrnavasso
27 Jun 193022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Novara, Italy
24 Apr 195446.6AppointedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
6 Jun 195446.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia, Italy
18 Aug 198577.9DiedBishop of Pistoia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Longo Dorni:
Bishop Mario Longo Dorni (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013