Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benvenuto Matteucci

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Pisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1910BornCarmignano
14 Aug 193222.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Aug 196858.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pisa, Italy
15 Aug 196858.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Popilii
21 Sep 196858.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forum Popilii
2 Jan 197160.9AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
7 Jun 198676.3RetiredArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
16 Jan 199383.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benvenuto Matteucci:
Archbishop Benvenuto Matteucci (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pisa

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013