Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Fallani

Deceased

Official of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular Archbishop of Parthenia

Titular See: (P.C. for Sacred Art)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1910Born
8 Dec 193323.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 196453.5AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
4 Jun 196453.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Parthenia
28 Jun 196453.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Parthenia
9 Aug 198271.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Parthenia
23 Jul 198574.6DiedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Fallani
Archbishop Giovanni Fallani (born , died ) Official of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast