Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrico Bartoletti

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lucca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1916BornCalenzano
27 Jul 193922.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 195841.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lucca, Italy
19 Jun 195841.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Myndus
8 Sep 195841.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myndus
2 Jan 197154.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lucca, Italy
2 Jan 197154.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myndus
20 Jan 197356.3SucceededArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
31 Mar 197356.5ResignedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
5 Mar 197659.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrico Bartoletti:
Archbishop Enrico Bartoletti (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lucca

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1974
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013