Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Niccoli

Deceased

Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1886Born
14 Aug 191023.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 193245.5AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
26 Jun 193245.6Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
5 Nov 196579.0DiedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Niccoli
Bishop Francesco Niccoli (born , died ) Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuco di Mugello

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast