Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni De Vivo

Deceased

Bishop of Pescia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1940Born
15 Mar 196423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
30 Sep 198646.5IncardinatedPriest of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy
18 Dec 199353.7AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
23 Jan 199453.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pescia, Italy
6 Mar 199453.9InstalledBishop of Pescia, Italy
20 Sep 201575.4DiedBishop of Pescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni De Vivo
Bishop Giovanni De Vivo (born , died ) Bishop of Pescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Archdiocese of Siena
Ordained BishopCathedral, Siena, Archdiocese of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino
Death PlacePescia, Diocese of Pescia
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Pescia, Diocese of Pescia

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,297
  • d: CB, 20 Sep 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)
  • loc: AM, 11 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Feb 2019

Quantcast