Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Charrier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1931Born
24 Jun 195624.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 198453.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Siena, Italy
29 Sep 198453.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cercina
29 Sep 198453.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montalcino, Italy
29 Sep 198453.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
11 Nov 198453.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cercina
30 Sep 198655.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy
22 Apr 198957.6AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
4 Apr 200775.5RetiredBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
7 Oct 201180.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Fernando Charrier
Bishop Fernando Charrier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourcet de Roure

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2007
  • d: CB, 7 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Jul 2017