Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Giorgio Debernardi

Bishop Emeritus of Pinerolo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1940 Born
27 Jun 196525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ivrea, Italy
7 Jul 199858.2AppointedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
20 Sep 199858.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
8 Nov 199858.6InstalledBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
7 Jul 201777.2RetiredBishop of Pinerolo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Giorgio Debernardi (VIAF: 74095907)
Bishop Pier Giorgio Debernardi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pinerolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFeletto, Diocese of Ivrea
Ordained PriestFeletto, Diocese of Ivrea
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Assunta, Church, San Benigno Canavese, Diocese of Ivrea

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pinerolo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,432
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2017
  • c1/loc: AM, 2 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Nov 2018

Quantcast