Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Derio Olivero

Bishop of Pinerolo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1961 Born
12 Sep 198726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Fossano, Italy
7 Jul 201756.3AppointedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
8 Oct 201756.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
15 Oct 201756.5InstalledBishop of Pinerolo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Derio Olivero
Bishop Derio Olivero (born ) Bishop of Pinerolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuneo, Diocese of Cuneo
Ordained BishopSan Giovenale, Cathedral, Fossano, Diocese of Fossano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pinerolo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2017
  • ob/c2/i: CB, 15 Jul 2017
  • c34: CB, 17 Jul 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,591

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast