Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cesare Nosiglia

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1944 Born
29 Jun 196823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Acqui, Italy
6 Jul 199146.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
6 Jul 199146.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Victoriana
14 Sep 199146.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Victoriana
19 Jul 199651.7AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
6 Oct 200359.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Vicenza, Italy
11 Oct 201066.0AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
21 Nov 201066.1InstalledArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Nosiglia (VIAF: 314791018)
Archbishop Cesare Nosiglia (born ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRossiglione

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,468, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 4 Oct 2018

Quantcast