Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Moretti

Archbishop of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1949 Born
30 Nov 197425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
3 Jul 199849.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
3 Jul 199849.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mopta
12 Sep 199849.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mopta
17 Oct 200354.6AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
17 Oct 200354.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mopta
10 Jun 201061.3AppointedArchbishop of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno, Italy
12 Sep 201061.5InstalledArchbishop of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Moretti
Archbishop Luigi Moretti (born ) Archbishop of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittareale

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,379

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast