Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Tuzia

Bishop Emeritus of Orvieto-Todi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1944 Born
29 Jun 196924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Subiaco, Italy
1 Sep 198035.6IncardinatedPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
28 Jan 200661.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
28 Jan 200661.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nepeta
12 Mar 200661.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nepeta
31 May 201267.4AppointedBishop of Orvieto-Todi, Italy
30 Jun 201267.5InstalledBishop of Orvieto-Todi, Italy
7 Mar 202075.2RetiredBishop of Orvieto-Todi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Tuzia
Bishop Benedetto Tuzia (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Orvieto-Todi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSubiaco
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orvieto-Todi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,088
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 May 2012
  • i: CB, 31 May 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast