Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Apicella

Bishop of Velletri-Segni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1947 Born
25 Mar 197225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
19 Jul 199649.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
19 Jul 199649.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ierafi
14 Sep 199649.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ierafi
28 Jan 200659.0AppointedBishop of Velletri-Segni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Apicella
Bishop Vincenzo Apicella (born ) Bishop of Velletri-Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

Please contact the Bishop through the Suburbicarian See of Velletri-Segni.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,790
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast