Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrico Cardinal Feroci

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria del Divino Amore a Castel di Leva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1940 Born
13 Mar 196524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
30 Oct 202080.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cures Sabinorum
15 Nov 202080.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cures Sabinorum
28 Nov 202080.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria del Divino Amore a Castel di Leva
28 Nov 202080.2Elevated to Cardinal

MicroData Summary for Enrico Feroci
Enrico Cardinal Feroci (born ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria del Divino Amore a Castel di Leva

EventPlace
Birth PlacePizzoli, Archdiocese of L’Aquila, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Divino Amore a Castel di Leva, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Cardinal Titular Church of Santa Maria del Divino Amore a Castel di Leva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 5 Nov 2020
  • c34: CB, 6 Nov 2020
  • 4c46: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2020, Number 19
  • loc: AM, 23 Nov 2020
  • cdea: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast