Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claudio Maria Celli

President of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications

Titular Archbishop of Cluentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1941 BornRimini, Italy
19 Mar 196523.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 199554.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cluentum
16 Dec 199554.4AppointedSecretary of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
6 Jan 199654.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cluentum
27 Jun 200765.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications
28 Feb 201371.6CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications
16 Mar 201371.7ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications

MicroData Summary for Claudio Maria Celli:
Archbishop Claudio Maria Celli (born ) President of Social Communications

Please contact the Archbishop through the Pontifical Council for Social Communications.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,642
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013