Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Benoni Ambăruş

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Truentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1974 Born
29 Jun 200025.7Ordained PriestPriest of Iaşi, Romania
21 Sep 200732.9IncardinatedPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
20 Mar 202146.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
20 Mar 202146.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Truentum
1 May 202146.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Truentum

MicroData Summary for Benoni Ambăruş
Father Benoni Ambăruş (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSomuşca-Bacău, Diocese of Iaşi, Romania
Ordained PriestIaşi, Diocese of Iaşi, Romania
Ordained BishopLateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2021
  • ob: CB, 20 Mar 2021
  • inca: AM, 20 Mar 2021
  • c2: CB, 18 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Apr 2021

Quantcast