Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Claude Périsset

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Germany

Titular Archbishop of Iustiniana Prima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1939 BornEstavayer-le-Lac, Switzerland
28 Jun 196425.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 199657.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Accia
16 Nov 199657.6AppointedOfficial of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
6 Jan 199757.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Accia
12 Nov 199859.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iustiniana Prima
12 Nov 199859.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Romania
22 Mar 200363.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Moldova, Republic of
15 Oct 200768.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
21 Sep 201374.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany

MicroData Summary for Jean-Claude Périsset:
Archbishop Jean-Claude Périsset (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Germany

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Germany.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,881
  • r?: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013