Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jenő Schönberger

Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1959 BornTurulung
23 Jun 198526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
30 Apr 200343.9AppointedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
21 Jun 200344.0Ordained BishopBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Jenő Schönberger:
Bishop Jenő Schönberger (born ) Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Satu Mare {Szatmár}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,414

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013