Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Tempfli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1931Born
31 May 196231.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 199058.9AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
26 Apr 199059.0Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
23 Dec 200877.7RetiredBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
25 May 201685.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for József Tempfli (VIAF: 42944614)
Bishop József Tempfli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCsanálos-Urziceni

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,871
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 25 May 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017