Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Endre Hamvas

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kalocsa, Hungary

Titular Archbishop of Arae in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1890Born
15 Jul 191323.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 194454.0AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
25 Mar 194454.0Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
15 Sep 196474.5AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
10 Jan 196978.8RetiredArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
10 Jan 196978.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Arae in Numidia
3 Apr 197080.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Endre Hamvas (VIAF: 88849828)
Archbishop Endre Hamvas (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kalocsa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiszke
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,944, Number 9
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 991, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast