Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lajos Shvoy

Deceased

Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1879Born
13 Jul 190122.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 192748.2AppointedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
1 Aug 192748.3Ordained BishopBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
21 Jan 196888.8DiedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Lajos Shvoy
Bishop Lajos Shvoy (born , died ) Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudapest

  • a priest for 66.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018