Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Imre Kisberk

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1906Born
22 Jun 193023.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 195144.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
11 Mar 195144.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Christianopolis
3 May 195144.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Christianopolis
10 Jan 196962.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
2 Feb 197467.4AppointedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
5 Apr 198275.5ResignedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
24 Apr 198275.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Imre Kisberk
Bishop Imre Kisberk (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePereszteg

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast