Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Rosta

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary

Titular Bishop of Garriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1913Born
29 Oct 193925.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 197864.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
2 Mar 197864.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Garriana
5 Apr 197864.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Garriana
28 Jul 197864.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Rosta
Bishop Ferenc Rosta (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuzsák

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018