Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop József Ijjas

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kalocsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1901BornBaja
14 Jun 192523.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 196462.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Csanád, Hungary
15 Sep 196462.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tagarata
28 Oct 196462.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tagarata
10 Jan 196967.1AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
5 Jun 198785.5RetiredArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
29 Apr 198987.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Ijjas:
Archbishop József Ijjas (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015