Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop György Zemplén, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Arena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1905Born
17 Aug 192217.0ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
27 Jun 192822.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Cistercians
30 Jun 192923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
10 Jan 196963.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
10 Jan 196963.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Arena
12 Feb 196963.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arena
29 Mar 197367.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for György Zemplén
Bishop György Zemplén O. Cist. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHannoversch Münden
Ordained BishopSaint-Etienne, Basilica, Budapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Death PlaceBudapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast