Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Kacziba

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Győr (Raab), Hungary

Titular Bishop of Cufruta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1914Born
20 Mar 193823.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 196954.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Győr (Raab), Hungary
10 Jan 196954.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cufruta
12 Feb 196954.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cufruta
7 Jan 197560.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Győr (Raab), Hungary
31 Aug 198975.1DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Kacziba
Bishop József Kacziba (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Győr (Raab)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCsanytelek
Ordained BishopSaint-Etienne, Basilica, Budapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1990
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 7 Mar 2019

Quantcast