Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Endre Gergely Kovács, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Eger, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Media


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1927Born
30 Aug 194719.8ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
8 Apr 195123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
7 Jan 197547.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
7 Jan 197547.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Media
6 Feb 197547.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Media
15 Jan 200375.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
29 Jul 200779.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Endre Gergely Kovács
Bishop Endre Gergely Kovács O. Cist. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Eger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEgerbakta

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • prof: CB, 15 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017