Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop István Seregély

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Eger, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1931Born
19 Jun 195524.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 198756.2AppointedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
25 Jul 198756.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
15 Mar 200776.0RetiredArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
31 Dec 201887.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for István Seregély (VIAF: 267400711)
Archbishop István Seregély (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Eger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzombathely
Death PlaceNyíregyháza

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 31 Dec 2018

Quantcast